EP1071847 - PAPER MACHINE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A PAPER WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Paper, Inc. Fabianinkatu 9 A 00130 Helsinki / FI | [2004/50] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Metso Paper, Inc. P.O. Box 587 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Metso Paper Karlstad Aktiebolag Box 1014 651 15 Karlstad / SE | ||
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states Valmet-Karlstad AB Box 1014 651 15 Karlstad / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hakanson, Carl Fridhemsgatan 6 S-654 61 Karlstad / SE | [2003/06] |
Former [2003/04] | 01 /
hakanson, Carl Fridhemsgatan 6 S-654 61 Karlstad / SE | ||
Former [2001/05] | 01 /
H KANSON, Carl Fridhemsgatan 6 S-654 61 Karlstad / SE | Representative(s) | Andréasson, Ivar Hynell Intellectual Property AB Hammarbybacken 27 120 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | Andréasson, Ivar Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/05] | Lundquist, Lars-Olof L-O Lundquist Patentbyra AB, Box 80 651 03 Karlstad / SE | Application number, filing date | 99910906.9 | 10.03.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999SE00361 | Priority number, date | SE19980000867 | 16.03.1998 Original published format: SE 9800867 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947747 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1071847 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1071847 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1071847 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/00 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
D21F3/045 (EP);
D21F2/00 (EP);
D21F3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/05] | Title | German: | PAPIERMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PAPIERBAHN | [2001/05] | English: | PAPER MACHINE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A PAPER WEB | [2001/05] | French: | MACHINE A PAPIER ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE BANDE PAPIER | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 11.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 03.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2003
26.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative Fries, Oliver, et al, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2003
26.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative Fries, Oliver, et al, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2003
Voith Paper Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative Fries, Oliver, et al, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | 29.01.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.04.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.04.2004 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2004 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 18.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.07.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 16.12.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 01.02.2007 | Appeal received No. T0177/07 | 29.03.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.07.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 22.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.07.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.02.2003 | [2010/30] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0159280 (BELOIT CORP [US]); | [A]US4976821 (LAAPOTTI JORMA [FI]); | [A]EP0598991 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) | Opposition | DE29701382U | EP0930392 |