25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
25.12.2009 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] |
18.12.2009 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
14.10.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
09.10.2009 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
27.07.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
24.07.2009 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
08.05.2009 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
08.05.2009 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
25.05.2007 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
05.04.2007 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
03.04.2007 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
03.02.2007 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
03.02.2007 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
21.11.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
21.11.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
14.07.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
16.03.2006 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
22.10.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] |
13.09.2004 |
New entry: Reply by parties involved to observations of proprietor |
|
02.07.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
26.04.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of observations of proprietor to parties involved + time limit |
|
26.04.2004 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
28.01.2004 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
21.11.2003 |
Opposition filed |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
19.11.2003 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
04.01.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
27.12.2002 |
Change - inventor |
published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] |
13.12.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.12.2002 |
Change - inventor |
published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] |
26.08.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.11.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] |
27.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.12.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] |
15.12.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] |
01.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|