Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1071847 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2010 | B2 | EP1071847 | 19.02.2003 | B1 | EP1071847 | 31.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9800867 | 16.03.1998 | SE9900361 | 10.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE232920T | 15.03.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | SE9800867 | 16.03.1998 | SE9900361 | 10.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69905457T | 08.07.2010 | T3 | DE69905457T | 11.09.2003 | T2 | DE69905457D1 | 27.03.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | SE9800867 | 16.03.1998 | SE9900361 | 10.03.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9947747 | Global Dossier | 23.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9800867 | 16.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE511667 | 08.11.1999 | C2 | SE9800867L | 17.09.1999 | L | SE9800867D0 | 16.03.1998 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE9800867 | 16.03.1998 |