Designated contracting states | AT | Lapse: 19.02.2003 | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | SE | | Examination procedure | 04.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | | 11.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 11.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | European patent granted | 19.02.2003 | Opposition procedure | 16.12.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | | Appeal following opposition | 01.02.2007 | APPEAL FILED | 29.03.2007 | APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED | 22.07.2009 | APPEAL RESULT | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 22.01.2003 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HAKANSON, CARL | | Event date: | 05.02.2003 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HAKANSON, CARL | | Event date: | 19.02.2003 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT DE FR GB IT SE | | Event date: | 27.03.2003 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69905457 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20030327 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 31.01.2001 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT DE FR GB IT SE | | Event date: | 31.01.2001 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20000911 | | Event date: | 09.01.2002 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AKTIEBOLAG | | Event date: | 19.02.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 18.07.2003 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 07.01.2004 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH | Effective DATE: | 20031112 | | Event date: | 18.08.2004 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | METSO PAPER, INC. | | Event date: | 18.08.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | | Event date: | 08.12.2004 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | METSO PAPER, INC. | | Event date: | 25.02.2005 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TP | Code Expl.: | TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | | Event date: | 27.06.2007 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | VOITH PATENT GMBH | Effective DATE: | 20031112 | | Event date: | 30.04.2009 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20090317 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 27.01.2010 | | Event description: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Effective DATE: | 20100127 | | Event date: | 27.01.2010 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B2 | Designated State(s): | AT DE FR GB IT SE | | Event date: | 29.04.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 31.05.2010 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20100402 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.06.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030219 | | Event date: | 30.06.2010 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20100322 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 31.08.2010 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20100329 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.11.2010 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20100312 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 23.11.2011 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20110310 | | Event date: | 23.12.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20111130 | | Event date: | 31.01.2012 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110331 | | Event date: | 29.02.2012 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110310 | | Event date: | 29.02.2012 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110310 | | Event date: | 31.05.2012 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20120323 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.07.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20100603 | | Event date: | 09.01.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 69905457 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20131001 | | Event date: | 31.01.2014 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20131001 | | Event date: | 03.04.2007 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO | | Event date: | 03.02.2007 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO | | Event date: | 03.02.2007 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O | | Event date: | 13.12.2002 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 26.08.2002 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 24.07.2009 | | Event description: | APPEAL PROCEDURE CLOSED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA9O | | Event date: | 05.04.2007 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O | | Event date: | 04.01.2003 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 25.12.2009 | | Event description: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009272 | | Event date: | 15.12.2000 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 25.12.2009 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT MAINTAINED AS AMENDED | | Event date: | 25.05.2007 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 26.04.2004 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Event date: | 28.01.2004 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 21.11.2003 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 19.11.2003 | | Event description: | UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO | |