EP1062824 - ACCOMMODATING PACKET DATA LOSS AT BASE STATIONS INTERFACING BETWEEN A PACKET SWITCHED NETWORK AND A CDMA MACRODIVERSITY NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Lars Torparegatan 37 2tr S-583 32 Linköping / SE | 02 /
SANDIN, Tomas Upplandsgatan 67 S-133 28 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
BUTOVITSCH, Peter Tranebergsvägen 39 S-167 45 Bromma / SE | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Forsberg, Ulrika S. Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Networks 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Forsberg, Ulrika S. Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Networks 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/02] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan, et al Ericsson AB, Patent Unit Radio Networks 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/16] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2000/52] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 99910911.9 | 10.03.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999SE00369 | Priority number, date | US19980042359 | 13.03.1998 Original published format: US 42359 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9946946 | Date: | 16.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062824 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062824 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04B7/02 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
H04B7/022 (EP,US);
H04W28/04 (KR);
H04W88/08 (KR);
H04W36/18 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON PAKETDATENVERLUSTEN IN BASISSTATIONEN ZWISCHEN EINEM PAKKETVERMITTLUNGSNETZWERK UND EINEM CDMA MAKRODIVERSITYNETZWERK | [2000/52] | English: | ACCOMMODATING PACKET DATA LOSS AT BASE STATIONS INTERFACING BETWEEN A PACKET SWITCHED NETWORK AND A CDMA MACRODIVERSITY NETWORK | [2000/52] | French: | PRISE EN COMPTE DE PERTE DE DONNEES EN PAQUET AU NIVEAU DE STATIONS DE BASE RELIANT UN RESEAU DE COMMUTATION DE PAQUETS ET UN RESEAU A ACCES MULTIPLE PAR DIFFERENCE DE CODE (AMDC), EN MODE MACRODIVERSITE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 24.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 19.04.2005 | [2005/48] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9532594 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP], et al); | [A]US5586119 (SCRIBANO GINO A [US], et al) |