EP1109676 - A DISPENSER FOR A STACK OF SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLSON, Casey, L. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
SILTBERG, Daniel, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
TRUSSELL, James, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
WINDORSKI, David, C. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/26] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99911447.3 | 18.03.1999 | [2001/26] | WO1999US05822 | Priority number, date | US19980144946 | 01.09.1998 Original published format: US 144946 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0012324 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1109676 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109676 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B42D5/00 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
B42D5/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/26] | Title | German: | SPENDER FÜR EINEN STAPEL VON BÖGEN | [2001/26] | English: | A DISPENSER FOR A STACK OF SHEETS | [2001/26] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE FEUILLES EN PILE | [2001/26] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP02026956.9 / EP1291198 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2465589 (RUBASTYL [FR]) [A] 1,39,42 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 39; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5358141 (CARLSON CASEY L [US], et al) [A] 4 * column 8, line 29 - column 9, line 28; figures 20-22 * |