EP1071660 - N-SULPHONYL AND N-SULPHINYL PHENYLGLYCINAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [2001/13] |
Former [2001/05] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
CY
LI
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEANGUENAT, André Birsigstrasse 81 CH-4054 Basel / CH | 02 /
ZELLER, Martin Kronengasse 7 CH-5400 Baden / CH | [2001/05] | Application number, filing date | 99911707.0 | 25.02.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999EP01216 | Priority number, date | GB19980004265 | 27.02.1998 Original published format: GB 9804265 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9943644 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1071660 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1071660 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C307/06, C07C311/06, A01N41/06 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
A01N41/02 (EP,US);
C07C307/06 (EP,KR,US);
A01N41/06 (EP,US);
C07C237/08 (EP,US);
C07C311/06 (EP,US);
C07C323/63 (EP,US);
C07D307/54 (EP,US);
C07D333/24 (EP,US);
C07D333/28 (EP,US);
C07C2603/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/05] | Title | German: | N-SULPHONYL UND N-SULPHINYL PHENYLGLYCINAMIDE | [2001/05] | English: | N-SULPHONYL AND N-SULPHINYL PHENYLGLYCINAMIDE | [2001/05] | French: | N-SULFONYL ET N-SULFINYL PHENYLGLYCINAMIDE | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.01.2003 | BE | 22.01.2003 | FI | 22.01.2003 | GR | 22.01.2003 | CY | 25.02.2003 | IE | 25.02.2003 | LU | 25.02.2003 | MC | 28.02.2003 | DK | 22.04.2003 | PT | 22.04.2003 | SE | 22.04.2003 | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
BE | 22.01.2003 | ||
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
CY | 25.02.2003 | ||
LU | 25.02.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
BE | 22.01.2003 | ||
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
CY | 25.02.2003 | ||
LU | 25.02.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
BE | 22.01.2003 | ||
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
LU | 25.02.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
BE | 22.01.2003 | ||
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 22.01.2003 | |
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 22.01.2003 | |
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 22.01.2003 | |
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 22.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0493683 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [DA] 1-12 * examples 5,52 *; | [A]WO9530651 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-12; | [PX]WO9838160 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-12* claims 1,7,8 *; | [X] - CLARK, C.R. ET AL., "Diastereoisomeric Derivatization and Liquid Chromatographic Analysis of N-(Phenylsulfonyl)-2-phenylglycine Aldose Reductase Inhibitors", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHIC SCIENCE, (199008), vol. 28, no. 8, pages 407 - 412, XP002106164 [X] 1 * table II * |