Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0062638 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB9900692 | 19.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002542460 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9900692 | 19.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3048699 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9900692 | 19.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1089644 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2003 | B1 | EP1089644 | 11.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB9900692 | 19.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1160002C | 04.08.2004 | C | CN1305350 | 25.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9900692 | 19.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1039040 | 20.05.2005 | B | HK1039040 | 12.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB9900692 | 19.04.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6449812 | 17.09.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | IB9900692 | 19.04.1999 |