EP1071516 - FOAM SPRAYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keltub B.V. Wolput 39 5251 CC Vlijmen / NL | [2001/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE REGT, Jeroen Musketier 9 NL-5346 WH Oss / NL | 02 /
VAN SWIETEN, Roy van Deelenstraat 109 NL-5256 JG Oud-Heusden / NL | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Spierenburg, Pieter Spierenburg & Partner AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Mellingerstrasse 12 5443 Niederrohrdorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Spierenburg, Pieter Spierenburg Helmle-Kolb & Partner AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Mellingerstrasse 12 5443 Niederrohrdorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 99912000.9 | 18.04.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999IB00704 | Priority number, date | CH19980000879 | 17.04.1998 Original published format: CH 87998 | [2001/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9954054 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1071516 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1071516 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
B05B11/1087 (EP,US);
B05B7/0037 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/05] | Title | German: | SCHAUMSPRÜHVORRICHTUNG | [2001/05] | English: | FOAM SPRAYING DEVICE | [2001/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PULVERISATION DE MOUSSE | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 25.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.04.2006 | CH | 30.04.2006 | LI | 30.04.2006 | [2007/31] |
Former [2007/22] | CH | 30.04.2006 | |
LI | 30.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0999259 ; | [A]CH404569 (TECH DE PULVERISATION PAR ABRE [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 4; claim 1 *; | [XA]FR2317969 (PLASTIC RESEARCH PRODUCTS [US]) [X] 1,8 * page 10, line 16 * * page 8, line 24 * * page 12, line 28 - line 29; figures 2A,6D,7A * [A] 9; | [XA]FR2397341 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 10; figure 1 * [A] 2,8-10; | [XA]EP0392238 (PFEIFFER ERICH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,8-10; | [A]WO9727947 (AIRSPRAY INT BV [NL], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]WO9741965 (VALOIS SA [FR], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 97, no. 8, & JP09099259 A 19970415 (PURESUKO) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9312829 |