26.09.2008 |
Refusal of application |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
05.09.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
10.06.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
20.05.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
02.04.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.01.2008 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
21.08.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
21.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2007 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.03.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.12.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.08.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.08.2004 |
First examination report |
|
21.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.12.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.01.2001 [2001/04] |
08.12.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.01.2001 [2001/04] |
21.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|