EP1069931 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ESTABLISHING CONTACT, BASED ON THE TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK, BETWEEN A SELECTION OF TV-VIEWERS AND AN ESTABLISHED GAME PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intermercial A.S. Lilleakerveien 10 0283 Oslo / NO | [2001/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NYBORG, Morten Lilleengveien 1B N-1342 Jar / NO | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [2001/04] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99912178.3 | 18.02.1999 | [2001/04] | WO1999NO00053 | Priority number, date | NO19980000714 | 20.02.1998 Original published format: NO 980714 | NO19980005731 | 08.12.1998 Original published format: NO 985731 | [2001/04] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9942187 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1069931 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/22, // H04N7:14 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
A63F13/12 (EP);
H04N7/14 (KR);
A63F13/338 (US);
A63F13/30 (EP);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
A63F2300/409 (EP);
A63F2300/63 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG UM EINE AUF EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK BASIERENDE VERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN EINER AUSWAHL VON FERNSEHZUSCHAUERN UND EINEM ETABLIERTEMSPIELPROGRAMM HERZUSTELLEN. | [2001/04] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ESTABLISHING CONTACT, BASED ON THE TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK, BETWEEN A SELECTION OF TV-VIEWERS AND AN ESTABLISHED GAME PROGRAM | [2001/04] | French: | METHODE ET APPAREIL POUR ETABLIR CONTACT VIA UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATION, ENTRE UNE SELECTION DE TELESPECTATEURS ET UN PROGRAMME DE JEU FONCTIONNANT | [2001/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.1999 | Translation filed | 01.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 01.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 31.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.06.2008 | 16.05.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/44] | 22.06.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 29.02.2008 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9320914 (ARENAS GROUP [US]); | [A]WO9405117 (DTMF TELEVISION INC [US]); | [A]US5545088 (KRAVITZ EDWARD A [US], et al); | [A]EP0745412 (TWO WAY TV LTD [GB]); | [A]US5679077 (POCOCK TERRENCE [CA], et al); | [A]US5719619 (HATTORI YOSHITSUGU [JP], et al) |