EP1064464 - VACUUM EJECTOR PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XEREX AB Box 4501 183 04 Täby / SE | [2004/15] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states PIAB AB P.O. Box 4501 183 04 Täby / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TELL, Peter Margretelundsvägen 40 S-184 60 Akersberga / SE | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Lindgren, Anders, et al Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 1344, Drottninggatan 7 751 43 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [2001/01] | Lindgren, Anders Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 1344, Drottninggatan 7 751 43 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 99912199.9 | 12.03.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999SE00386 | Priority number, date | SE19980000943 | 20.03.1998 Original published format: SE 9800943 | [2001/01] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9949216 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1064464 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064464 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP1064464 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04C5/00 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
F04F5/467 (EP,US);
F04F5/22 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/01] | Title | German: | VAKUUM EJEKTORPUMPE | [2001/01] | English: | VACUUM EJECTOR PUMP | [2001/01] | French: | POMPE A VIDE A EJECTEUR | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1999 | Translation filed | 26.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 26.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 25.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Limitations: | 20.12.2007 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 27.05.2008 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 12.06.2008 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4759691 (KROUPA LARRY G [US]); | [A]US4880358 (LASTO CLIFFORD S [US]); | [A]US5683227 (NAGAI SHIGEKAZU [JP], et al) |