EP1058737 - NOVEL FDRG PROTEIN AND NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES AND USES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | For all designated states DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE 44 Binney Street Boston Massachusetts 02115 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | ||
For all designated states DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE 44 Binney Street Boston Massachusetts 02115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLTZMAN, Douglas, A. 76 Fairmont Street 1 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
SPIEGELMAN, Bruce, M. 271 Waban Avenue Waban, MA 02468 / US | 03 /
YOON, Clifford, Hyunsuk Apartment 10 24 Peabody Terrace Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence, The Old College, 53 High Street Horley, Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99912241.9 | 02.03.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999US04548 | Priority number, date | US19980033539 | 02.03.1998 Original published format: US 33539 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9945135 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058737 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, C12Q1/68 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
C07K14/515 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07K16/22 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | FDRG PROTEIN UND NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜLE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2006/04] | English: | NOVEL FDRG PROTEIN AND NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES AND USES THEREFOR | [2000/50] | French: | NOUVELLES MOLECULES FDRG DE PROTEINES ET D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE ET UTILISATION DESDITES MOLECULES | [2000/50] |
Former [2000/50] | FDRG PROTEIN UND NUKLEISÄUREMOLEKÜLE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 09.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/02] | 09.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9611269 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * figure 6 *; | [E]WO9915654 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [E] 1,3-8,10-22,25 * SEQ ID NOs 1,2; page 33, line 1 - page 36, line 16; figures 2,3; examples 9-14 *; | [E]WO9932515 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [E] 1,3-8,10-22,25 * SEQ ID NOs 1,2 *; | [X] - HILLIER L. ET AL., "yw93f11.r1 Soares_placenta_8to9weeks_2NbHP8to9W Homo sapiens cDNA clone.", EMBL, (19960229), Database accession no. N57259, URL: EBI, XP002217323 [X] 1,3,18 * abstract * | [T] - KIM I ET AL, "HEPATIC EXPRESSION, SYNTHESIS AND SECRETION OF A NOVEL FIBRINOGEN/ANGIOPOIETIN-RELATED PROTEIN THAT PREVENTS ENDOTHELIAL-CELL APOPTOSIS", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, THE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, GB, (20000315), vol. 346, no. 3, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 603 - 610, XP000971125 [T] * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/0264-6021:3460603 | [T] - KERSTEN SANDER ET AL, "Characterization of the fasting-induced adipose factor FIAF, a novel peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor target gene.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20000915), vol. 275, no. 37, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 28488 - 28493, XP002217322 [T] * figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M004029200 | International search | [A] - MATSUSHITA M, ET AL., "A NOVEL HUMAN SERUM LECTIN WITH COLLAGEN- AND FIBRINOGEN-LIKE DOMAINS THAT FUNCTIONS AS AN OPSONIN", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19960202), vol. 271, no. 05, doi:10.1074/jbc.271.23.13770, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 2448 - 2454, XP002918842 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.23.13770 | [A] - ICHIJO H, ET AL., "MOLECULAR CLONING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF FICOLIN, A MULTIMERIC PROTEIN WITH FIBRINOGEN- AND COLLAGEN-LIKE DOMAINS", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19930705), vol. 269, no. 19, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 14505 - 14513, XP002918843 | [A] - LE Y, ET AL., "PURIFICATION AND BINDING PROPERTIES OF A HUMAN FICOLIN-LIKE PROTEIN", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS., ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM., NL, NL, (19970101), vol. 204, doi:10.1016/S0022-1759(97)00029-X, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 43 - 49, XP002918844 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(97)00029-X |