EP1062514 - C-MYC CODING REGION DETERMINANT-BINDING PROTEIN (CRD-BP) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION 614 North Walnut Street Madison, WI 53705 / US | [2000/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSS, Jeffrey 4749 LaFayette Drive Madison, WI 53705 / US | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99912296.3 | 05.03.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999US04897 | Priority number, date | US19980077372P | 09.03.1998 Original published format: US 77372 P | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9946594 | Date: | 16.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1062514 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062514 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, C12Q1/68 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
G01N33/57484 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
G01N33/57415 (EP,US);
G01N33/57419 (EP,US);
G01N33/57438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | C-MYC-BINDENDES PROTEIN "C-MYC CODING REGION DETERMINANT-BINDING PROTEIN (CRD-BP)" | [2000/52] | English: | C-MYC CODING REGION DETERMINANT-BINDING PROTEIN (CRD-BP) | [2000/52] | French: | PROTEINE LIEE AU DETERMINANT DE REGION DE CODAGE C-MYC (CRD-BP) ET SA SEQUENCE D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 04.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2004 | BE | 06.10.2004 | CH | 06.10.2004 | FI | 06.10.2004 | LI | 06.10.2004 | GR | 06.01.2005 | SE | 06.01.2005 | ES | 17.01.2005 | CY | 05.03.2005 | LU | 05.03.2005 | PT | 06.03.2005 | IE | 07.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
CY | 05.03.2005 | ||
LU | 05.03.2005 | ||
IE | 07.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
CY | 05.03.2005 | ||
IE | 07.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
IE | 07.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
BE | 06.10.2004 | ||
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 06.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XA] - LEEDS, P. ET AL., "Developmental regulation of CRD-BP, an RNA-binding protein that stabilizes c-myc mRNA in vitro", ONCOGENE, (19970320), vol. 14, no. 11, pages 1279 - 1286, XP002118533 [X] 17 * page 1280, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 4 * * page 1282, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1283, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1284, column 1, paragraph 5 - column 2, paragraph 1 * [A] 1-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1201093 | [A] - MÜLLER-PILLASCH, F. ET AL., "Cloning of a gene highly overexpressed in cancer coding for a novel KH-domain containing protein", ONCOGENE, (19970605), vol. 14, no. 22, pages 2729 - 2733, XP002118534 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1201110 | [A] - DOYLE, G.A.R. ET AL., "The c-myc coding region determinant-binding protein: a member of a family of KH domain RNA-binding proteins", NUCLEIC ACID RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 26, no. 22, pages 5036 - 5044, XP002118535 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/26.22.5036 |