EP1061914 - LIPOIC ACID ANALOGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 300 Lakeside Drive 22nd Floor Oakland California 94612-3550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PACKER, Lester Dept. of Molecular & Cell Biology 251 LSA University of California - Berkeley Berkeley, CA 94720-3200 / US | 02 /
TIROSH, Oren 6 Mazhe Street 4 Holon 58285 / IR | 03 /
SEN, Chandan, K. Dept. of Molecular & Cell Biology 251 LSA University of California - Berkeley Berkeley, CA 94720-3200 / US | 04 /
ROY, Sashwati 4804 Sapwood Drive Columbus, Ohio 43054 / US | [2001/16] |
Former [2001/14] | 01 /
PACKER, Lester Dept. of Molecular & Cell Biology 251 LSA University of California - Berkeley Berkeley, CA 94720-3200 / US | ||
02 /
TIROSH, Oren 6 Mazhe Street 4 Holon 58285 / IR | |||
03 /
SEN, Chandan, K. Dept. of Molecular & Cell Biology 251 LSA University of California - Berkeley Berkeley, CA 94720-3200 / US | |||
04 /
ROY, Sashwati Dept. of Molecular & Cell Biology 251 LSA University of California - Berkeley Berkeley, CA 94720-3200 / US | |||
Former [2000/52] | 01 /
PACKER, Lester Dept. of Molecular & Cell Biology 251 LSA University of California - Berkeley Berkeley, CA 94720-3200 / US | ||
02 /
TIROSH, Oren Dept. of Molecular & Cell Biology 251 LSA University of California - Berkeley Berkeley, CA 94720-3200 / US | |||
03 /
SEN, Chandan, K. Dept. of Molecular & Cell Biology 251 LSA University of California - Berkeley Berkeley, CA 94720-3200 / US | |||
04 /
ROY, Sashwati Dept. of Molecular & Cell Biology 251 LSA University of California - Berkeley Berkeley, CA 94720-3200 / US | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/52] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99912301.1 | 05.03.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999US04933 | Priority number, date | US19980037782 | 10.03.1998 Original published format: US 37782 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9945922 | Date: | 16.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1061914 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/385, C07D339/02 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
C07D339/04 (EP,US);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/52] | Title | German: | LIPOINSÄUREANALOGE | [2000/52] | English: | LIPOIC ACID ANALOGS | [2000/52] | French: | ANALOGUES D'ACIDE LIPOIQUE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 23.02.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5334612 (KALDEN JOACHIM [DE], et al) |