EP1079722 - PAPER TOWEL DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION 133 Peachtree Street, N.E., P.O. Box 105605 Atlanta, GA 30348-5605 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Georgia-Pacific Corporation 133 Peachtree Street, N.E., P.O. Box 105605 Atlanta, GA 30348-5605 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORMON, John, S. 565 Golden Links Drive Orange Park, FL 32073 / US | 02 /
MORRIS, Andrew, R. 3531 Olympic Drive Green Cove Springs, FL 32043 / US | 03 /
MURPHY, James, H. 14 Versaggi Road St. Augustine, FL 32084 / US | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99912581.8 | 16.03.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999US05732 | Priority number, date | US19980081637 | 20.05.1998 Original published format: US 81637 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9959457 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1079722 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/36 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
A47K10/36 (EP,US);
A47K10/3612 (EP,US);
A47K10/3625 (EP,US);
A47K2010/3668 (EP,US);
Y10T225/10 (EP,US);
Y10T225/12 (EP,US);
Y10T225/205 (EP,US);
Y10T225/209 (EP,US);
Y10T225/21 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | PAPIERHANDTUCHSPENDER | [2001/10] | English: | PAPER TOWEL DISPENSER | [2001/10] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE PAPIER ESSUIE-TOUT | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 13.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/10] | 18.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/10] | Divisional application(s) | EP02028253.9 / EP1297770 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE3342921 (TRATZ LEONHARD) [X] 1,7,21,24,25,27,28,33,34 * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 9 * * figure . * [A] 14,26,30; | [DXA]US4666099 (HOFFMAN LOUIS S [US], et al) [DX] 14,16-20,30 * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 16 * * figures 1-5 *[A] 1,2,7,8,10,11; | [XA]US4960248 (BAUER ALBERT H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10-14,17-20,24,30 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 2 * * column 5, line 1 - line 8 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 21,23,26,27,33,34 | by applicant | US2930663 | US3269592 | US3858951 | US4666099 | US4712461 | US4738176 | US4796825 | US5452832 |