EP1099329 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING CLIENT REQUESTS IN CLIENT-SERVER NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard, SC4-202 Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Ipivot, Inc. 12568 Kirkham Court Poway, CA 92064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JARDIN, Cary, A. 12 Calle de las Rosas San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 02 /
SCHNETZLER, Steven 28373 Alamar Valley Center, CA 92082 / US | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/20] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99912946.3 | 30.03.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999US06911 | Priority number, date | US19980054304 | 02.04.1998 Original published format: US 54304 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9952254 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1099329 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099329 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04L67/1012 (EP);
H04L67/01 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/20] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERWALTEN VON ANFORDERUNGEN DER BENUTZER IN BENUTZER-ANBIETER-NETZEN | [2007/48] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING CLIENT REQUESTS IN CLIENT-SERVER NETWORKS | [2001/20] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE GESTION DE DEMANDES CLIENT DANS DES RESEAUX CLIENT/SERVEUR | [2001/20] |
Former [2001/20] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERWALTEN VON ANFORDERUNGEN DER BENUTZER IN BENUTZER-ANBIETER-NETZE | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 03.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.01.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   26.02.2001 | 26.01.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   26.02.2001 | 26.01.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   26.02.2001 | 26.01.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   26.02.2001 | 26.01.2001 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   26.02.2001 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.01.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   26.02.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 26.12.2007 | IT | 31.03.2008 | [2011/28] |
Former [2008/27] | NL | 26.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5708832 (INNISS HADYN A [US], et al) [A] 1-19* column 3, line 26 - line 60 *; | [PX]EP0865180 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [PX] 1,11 * column 3, line 6 - line 35 *; | [A] - ADLER R M, "DISTRIBUTED COORDINATION MODELS FOR CLIENT/SERVER COMPUTING", COMPUTER, (19950401), vol. 28, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9162, pages 14 - 22, XP000507856 [A] 1-19 * page 15, column R, line 1 - page 16, column L, line 4 * * page 17, column R, line 18 - page 18, column L, line 30 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.375173 |