EP1071688 - PREPARATION OF SPIRO BIS-PHOSPHITES USING FINELY GROUND PENTAERYTHRITOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARLIN, Gary 116 Columbus Street Morgantown, WV 26505 / US | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr., et al London Patent Operation, GE International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99912952.1 | 30.03.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999US07054 | Priority number, date | US19980061292 | 16.04.1998 Original published format: US 61292 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9952916 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1071688 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1071688 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/6574 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
C07F9/65746 (EP,US);
C07F9/6574 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/05] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON SPIROBIS-PHOSPHITEN AUS FEINGEMAHLENEM PENTAERYTHRITOL | [2001/48] | English: | PREPARATION OF SPIRO BIS-PHOSPHITES USING FINELY GROUND PENTAERYTHRITOL | [2001/05] | French: | PREPARATION DE SPIRO BIS-PHOSPHITES A L'AIDE DE PENTAERYTHRITOL FINEMENT BROYE | [2001/05] |
Former [2001/05] | HERSTELLUNG VON SPIROBIS-PHOSPHITEN AUS FEINGEMÄHLENEN PENTAERYTHRITOL | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 12.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.09.2002 | FI | 25.09.2002 | GR | 25.09.2002 | DK | 25.12.2002 | SE | 25.12.2002 | PT | 26.12.2002 | CY | 30.03.2003 | LU | 30.03.2003 | IE | 31.03.2003 | MC | 31.03.2003 | [2007/22] |
Former [2007/04] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
FI | 25.09.2002 | ||
GR | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
CY | 30.03.2003 | ||
LU | 30.03.2003 | ||
IE | 31.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
FI | 25.09.2002 | ||
GR | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
CY | 30.03.2003 | ||
LU | 30.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
FI | 25.09.2002 | ||
GR | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
CY | 30.03.2003 | ||
LU | 30.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
FI | 25.09.2002 | ||
GR | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
LU | 30.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 25.09.2002 | |
FI | 25.09.2002 | ||
GR | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | FI | 25.09.2002 | |
GR | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 25.09.2002 | |
GR | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 25.09.2002 | |
SE | 25.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB951670 (BOYER & CIE SA) [A] 1-24* see page 1, right-hand column, lines 38-41 and claim 3 *; | [A]EP0159294 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4739090 (TAJIMA KENJI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-24 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9948900 |