EP1068436 - METHOD FOR EQUALISING THE CYLINDERS OF A DIRECT INJECTION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRZYMUSINSKI, Achim Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 21 D-93049 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
SCHERNEWSKI, Ralf Kanonierstrasse 23 D-76185 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
KÄRCHER, Andreas Wilzerstrasse 1 D-76356 Weingarten / DE | [2001/03] | Application number, filing date | 99913112.1 | 10.03.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999DE00654 | Priority number, date | DE1998114155 | 30.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19814155 | [2001/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9950547 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068436 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1068436 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/14 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
F02D41/1498 (EP,US);
F02D2200/1015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZYLINDERGLEICHSTELLUNG BEI EINER MIT DIREKTEINSPRITZUNG ARBEITENDEN BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2001/03] | English: | METHOD FOR EQUALISING THE CYLINDERS OF A DIRECT INJECTION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2001/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE MISE AU MEME NIVEAU DES CYLINDRES D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A INJECTION DIRECTE | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4705000 (MATSUMURA TOSHIMI [JP], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE19627540 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 36 - line 61; figure - *; | [A]DE19713104 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * |