EP1071440 - NOVEL SYNERGISTIC COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING AROMATIC COMPOUNDS AND TERPENOIDS PRESENT IN ALPINIA GALANGA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROVITA A/S Svejsegangen 4 2690 Karlslunde / DK | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states Ida Development A/S Symbion Science Park, Fruebjergvej 3 2100 Copenhagen / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIDNER, Morten, Sloth Solbakken 7 DK-2830 Virum / DK | 02 /
PETERSEN, Morten, Just Inavej 21 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | 03 /
JENSEN, Nina Worm Acacievej 2 DK-4600 Koge / DK | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Nilausen, Kim, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Nilausen, Kim, et al Zacco Denmark A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2001/05] | Nyeng, Joergen, et al Hofman-Bang A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 99913123.8 | 16.04.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999DK00213 | Priority number, date | DK19980000532 | 16.04.1998 Original published format: DK 53298 | DK19980001344 | 20.10.1998 Original published format: DK 134498 | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9953935 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1071440 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1071440 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/9062, A61P29/00, A61P37/00 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A61K36/9062 (EP,US);
A61K36/9068 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/48, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/9062, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/9068, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/05] | A61K35/78 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/05] | Title | German: | NEUE SYNERGISTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE AROMATISCHE VERBINDUNGEN UND IN ALPINIA GALANGA VORHANDENE TERPENOIDE ENTHALTEN | [2001/05] | English: | NOVEL SYNERGISTIC COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING AROMATIC COMPOUNDS AND TERPENOIDS PRESENT IN ALPINIA GALANGA | [2001/05] | French: | NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS SYNERGIQUES CONTENANT DES COMPOSES AROMATIQUES ET DES TERPENOIDES PRESENTS CHEZ ALPINIA GALANGA | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 14.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 13.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2007 | BE | 03.01.2007 | CH | 03.01.2007 | LI | 03.01.2007 | GR | 04.04.2007 | IE | 16.04.2007 | LU | 16.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | PT | 04.06.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2009/18] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 16.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X] - A.M. JANSSEN ET AL., "Acetoxychavicol Acetate, an Antifungal Component of Alpina galanga", PLANTA MEDICA, (1985), vol. 6, pages 507 - 511 | [X] - YU JINGGUANG ET AL., "Identification of the chemical components of two Alpinia species", CAPLUS, STN INTERNATIONAL, DOCUMENT NO. 109:134876 | [ ] - ZHONGYAO TONGBAO, (1988), vol. 13(6), pages 354 - 356 | [X] - WILLD L. MORI, HIDEKI ET AL., "Potent aroma components of rhizomes from Alpinia galanga", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19960226), vol. 124, no. 9, Database accession no. 115734 | [ ] - NIPPON SHOKUHIN KAGAKU KOGAKU KAISHA, (1995), vol. 42(12), pages 989 - 995 |