EP1055021 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING POLYKETONE FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acordis Industrial Fibers BV Westervoortsedijk 73 6827 AV Arnhem / NL | [2001/12] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIDDELJANS, Hendrik De Vlashegge 77 NL-6951 NM Dieren / NL | 02 /
VEURINK, Jannes Burgemeester de Wijslaan 26 NL-6971 CD Brummen / NL | 03 /
JUIJN, Johannes, Anthony Zilvermeeuwstraat 10 NL-6883 CE Velp / NL | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Fett, Günter, et al CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Fett, Günter, et al Acordis AG Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 99913152.7 | 09.02.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999EP00859 | Priority number, date | NL19981008280 | 12.02.1998 Original published format: NL 1008280 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9941437 | Date: | 19.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1055021 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1055021 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/30 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
D01F6/30 (EP,KR,US);
D01D5/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2000/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYKETONFASERN | [2000/48] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING POLYKETONE FIBRES | [2000/48] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PREPARER DES FIBRES DE POLYCETONE | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 20.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.02.2004 | NL | 04.02.2004 | [2006/12] |
Former [2004/43] | AT | 04.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0289077 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [DA]EP0310171 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [DA] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0326223 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0478088 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9314134 (AKZO NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9420562 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |