EP1066024 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HIGH VISCOSITY COSMETIC CLEANSERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/17] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAHRE, Jörg Am Treppchen 8 D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | 02 /
WADLE, Armin Willbecker Strasse 105 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | 03 /
SUMSER, Markus Am Düngelbruch 50 D-44625 Herne / DE | [2001/02] | Application number, filing date | 99913290.5 | 23.03.1999 | [2001/02] | WO1999EP01938 | Priority number, date | DE1998114608 | 01.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19814608 | [2001/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9951199 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066024 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1066024 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/06 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
A61K8/342 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOSMETISCHEN REINIGUNGSMITTELN MIT ERHÖHTER VISKOSITÄT | [2001/02] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HIGH VISCOSITY COSMETIC CLEANSERS | [2001/02] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES NETTOYANTS COSMETIQUES A VISCOSITE ELEVEE | [2001/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 27.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 23.10.2002 | GB | 23.10.2002 | GR | 23.10.2002 | IE | 23.10.2002 | NL | 23.10.2002 | DK | 23.01.2003 | PT | 23.01.2003 | SE | 23.01.2003 | AT | 23.03.2003 | CY | 23.03.2003 | LU | 23.03.2003 | BE | 31.03.2003 | CH | 31.03.2003 | LI | 31.03.2003 | MC | 31.03.2003 | [2007/22] |
Former [2005/02] | FI | 23.10.2002 | |
GB | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
AT | 23.03.2003 | ||
CY | 23.03.2003 | ||
LU | 23.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | FI | 23.10.2002 | |
GB | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
AT | 23.03.2003 | ||
CY | 23.03.2003 | ||
LU | 23.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 23.10.2002 | |
GB | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
AT | 23.03.2003 | ||
LU | 23.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | FI | 23.10.2002 | |
GB | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
AT | 23.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | FI | 23.10.2002 | |
GB | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | FI | 23.10.2002 | |
GB | 23.10.2002 | ||
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
CH | 31.03.2003 | ||
LI | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 23.10.2002 | |
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/42] | GR | 23.10.2002 | |
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 23.10.2002 | |
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 23.10.2002 | |
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 23.01.2003 | |
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 23.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1537112 (GRUENAU GMBH CHEM FAB) [X] 1-5,7 * page 2, line 73 - line 117; example - *; | [A]DE3304897 (REHBERG INGE) [A] 1-3,7 * claim - *; | [A]WO9112880 (FIORENZA ARCHIMEDE [IT]) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 20 - line 27; example -; claim - *; | [A]DE4338999 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,4-8 * claim - *; | [X]DE19529907 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-7 * page 4, line 58 - line 67; example -; claim - *; | [E]DE19755491 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [E] 1-8* the whole document * | Examination | WO9909949 | WO9909948 | WO9921138 |