EP0993700 - A METHOD, DEVICE AND CARRIER FOR ENCODING MULTIWORD INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:SE
PHILIPS AB Kottbygatan 7 Kista 164 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:SE
PHILIPS AB Kottbygatan 7, Kista 164 85 Stockholm / SE | |||
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:SE
PHILIPS AB Kottbygatan 7, Kista 164 85 Stockholm / SE | |||
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAHLMAN, Josephus, A., H., M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Faessen, Louis Marie Hubertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Faessen, Louis Marie Hubertus INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99913525.4 | 22.04.1999 | [2000/16] | WO1999IB00729 | Priority number, date | EP19980201395 | 29.04.1998 Original published format: EP 98201395 | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9960706 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0993700 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993700 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/22 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
G11B20/1833 (EP,US);
H03M13/00 (KR);
G11B20/1866 (EP,US);
H03M13/2954 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND TRÄGER ZUM AUFNEHMEN VON MULTIWORT-INFORMATION | [2000/16] | English: | A METHOD, DEVICE AND CARRIER FOR ENCODING MULTIWORD INFORMATION | [2000/16] | French: | PROCEDE, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT POUR CODER UNE INFORMATION MULTIMOT | [2000/16] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 29.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Request for further processing for: | 20.12.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2005 | Decision despatched | 10.07.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 10.07.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.07.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4559625 (BERLEKAMP ELWYN R [US], et al); | [A]US5299208 (BLAUM MIGUEL M [US], et al); | [A]US5651015 (BAIN PETER DOUGLAS [CA]); | [A]US5696774 (INOUE SADAYUKI [JP], et al) |