EP1053614 - DENSE WDM IN THE 1310NM BAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MCI Worldcom, Inc. 515 East Amite Street Jackson, MS 39201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states MCI Worldcom, Inc. 515 East Amite Street Jackson, MS 39201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOK, Joseph, C. 1434 O'Shannon Lane Garland, TX 75044 / US | 02 /
MAO, Xiaoping, C. 7308 Family Farm Road Plano, TX 75024 / US | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 10a 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Herzogspitalstrasse 10a 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/47] | Rupp, Christian, Dipl.Phys., et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99913813.4 | 19.02.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999US03573 | Priority number, date | US19980075404P | 20.02.1998 Original published format: US 75404 P | US19980106725 | 29.06.1998 Original published format: US 106725 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9943118 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053614 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.08.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02, H04B10/00, H04B10/18 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
H04B10/25133 (EP);
H04J14/02 (EP);
H04B2210/258 (EP);
H04J14/0224 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/47] | H04J14/02, H04B10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | DICHTES WDM IM 1310NM-BAND | [2000/47] | English: | DENSE WDM IN THE 1310NM BAND | [2000/47] | French: | MRL DENSE DANS LA BANDE 1310NM | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 17.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/26] | 21.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0444348 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 2,3,15,16,32 * column 6, line 15 - line 20; figures 2,3 * [A] 1,4-8,11-14,17-21,24,25,27,29 [Y] 30,31; | [Y]EP0546707 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [Y] 30,31* page 13, line 47 - line 58; figure 22 *; | [X]US5696614 (ISHIKAWA GEORGE [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,11-21,24,25,27,29,32 * column 3, line 10 - line 14 * * column 16, lines 27-34 * * column 25, line 11 - line 22 * * column 27, line 38 - line 43 * * column 31, line 21 - line 27 * * figure 5 * | International search | [Y]US5343322 (PIRIO FRANCIS [FR], et al); | [Y]US5696614 (ISHIKAWA GEORGE [JP], et al) |