blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0985190

EP0985190 - A METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING RISK MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.05.2003  [2003/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pich Le-Winter, Eva
35-10 Davies Manor
Memphis, TN 38133 / US
[2000/11]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Pezzoli, Ennio, et al
Jacobacci & Perani S.p.A.
Via Senato 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]Pezzoli, Ennio, et al
Jacobacci & Perani S.p.A. Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99913883.716.03.1999
[2000/11]
WO1999US05574
Priority number, dateUS1998004969027.03.1998         Original published format: US 49690
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9950774
Date:07.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0985190
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/60
[2000/11]
CPC:
G06Q40/08 (EP,US); G06Q40/00 (EP,US); G06Q40/03 (EP,US);
G06Q40/06 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/11]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR RISIKO-VERWALTUNGS-OPTIMIERUNG[2000/11]
English:A METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING RISK MANAGEMENT[2000/11]
French:PROCEDE D'OPTIMISATION DE LA GESTION DE RISQUES[2000/11]
Entry into regional phase07.12.1999National basic fee paid 
07.12.1999Search fee paid 
07.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/11]
01.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/20]
13.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200103   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.2001
31.03.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US4953085  (ATKINS CHARLES A [US]);
 [A]US5649116  (MCCOY RANDAL A [US], et al);
 [A]US5806049  (PETRUZZI CHRISTOPHER R [US]);
 [AE]US5884287  (EDESESS MICHAEL [US]);
 [A]  - CARIBBEAN BUSINESS, "Computers Help Manage Cash Flows", STN PROMT, (19000101), Database accession no. 01431610, XP002921122
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.