blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1064376

EP1064376 - GFR-ALPHA3 AND ITS USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/01]GFR$g(a)3 AND ITS USES
[2005/34]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/11]For all designated states
GENENTECH, INC.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DE SAUVAGE, Frederic, J.
187 Shooting Star Isle
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
02 / KLEIN, Robert, D.
1044 Webster Street
Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US
03 / PHILLIPS, Heidi, S.
15 Pine Avenue
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
04 / ROSENTHAL, Arnon
40 Tulip Court
Burlingame, CA 94010 / US
[2001/01]
Representative(s)Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99913993.419.03.1999
[2001/01]
WO1999US06098
Priority number, dateUS19980079124P23.03.1998         Original published format: US 79124 P
US19980081569P13.04.1998         Original published format: US 81569 P
[2001/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9949039
Date:30.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1064376
Date:03.01.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1064376
Date:15.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/12, C07K14/71, C12N15/85, C12N15/70, C12N15/81, C12N1/19, C12N5/10, C12N1/21, C07K19/00, C07K16/28, G01N33/68, C12Q1/42, A61K39/395
[2001/01]
CPC:
C07K16/2863 (EP,US); A61P1/02 (EP); A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP); A61P17/02 (EP); A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP); A61P25/02 (EP); A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP); A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP); C07K14/71 (EP,US); C12Q1/485 (EP,US);
G01N33/573 (EP,US); G01N33/74 (EP,US); C07K2317/75 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US); G01N2500/04 (EP,US); G01N2500/10 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/01]
TitleGerman:GFR-ALPHA3 UND SEINE VERWENDUNGEN[2005/34]
English:GFR-ALPHA3 AND ITS USES[2005/34]
French:LE GFR-ALPHA3 ET SES UTILISATIONS[2005/34]
Former [2001/01]GFRALPHA3 UND SEINE VERWENDUNGEN
Former [2001/01]GFR$g(a)3 AND ITS USES
Former [2001/01]LE GFR$g(a)3 ET SES UTILISATIONS
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase28.09.2000National basic fee paid 
28.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.09.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
02.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2005Fee for grant paid
25.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY15.03.2006
FI15.03.2006
LU19.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT16.08.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]FI15.03.2006
LU19.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT16.08.2006
Former [2007/22]FI15.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT16.08.2006
Former [2006/46]FI15.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/36]FI15.03.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9733912  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-66 * page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 3 * * page 14, line 12 - page 26, line 12 * * page 29, line 1 - page 34, line 7 * * page 43, line 18 - page 44, line 18 * * page 51, line 14 - page 57, line 8; example - *;
 [X]WO9744356  (BIOGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * page 2, line 10 - line 19 * * page 2, line 24 - page 5, line 2; figures 9,10 * * page 11, line 15 - line 29 * * page 16, line 5 - line 16 * * page 31, line 15 - page 34, line 17 * * see SEQ ID NO:20 and 21 *;
 [PX]EP0846764  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB]) [PX] 1,2,4-17,19,23-25 * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 7 * * page 3, line 36 - page 5, line 51 ** page 6, line 50 - page 7, line 11 *;
 [PX]WO9853069  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-25 * page 4, line 3 - line 13 * * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 4; figure 7 * * page 8, line 3 - line 13 * * page 10, line 9 - page 12, line 9 * * page 18, line 11 - line 24 * * page 28, line 10 - line 19 * * page 29, line 23 - page 30, line 19 * * page 31, line 6 - page 32, line 10 * * page 35, line 4 - line 14; examples 7,9,10 *;
 [PX]WO9854213  (AMGEN INC [US]) [PX] 1-19,23-25 * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 6 * * page 7, line 26 - line 35 * * page 8, line 9 - line 20 * * page 11, line 30 - line 31; figure 15 * * page 15, line 36 - page 17, line 4 * * page 23, line 37 - page 32, line 30 * * page 42, line 9 - line 22; example 11 * * see sequence listing SEQ ID NOs: 37 and 38 *;
 [X]  - SHUQIAN JING ET AL., "GFRalpha-2 and GFRalpha-3 are two new receptors for ligands of the GDNF family", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, (19971226), vol. 272, no. 52, pages 33111 - 33117, XP002065824 [X] 1-25 * abstract * * page 33111, column R, paragraph L - page 33112, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 33112, column R, paragraph L - page 33114, column L, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.52.33111
 [X]  - WINFIRED KAMMER ET AL., "Homodimerization of Interleukin-4 receptor alpha chain can induce intracellular signalling", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, (19960927), vol. 271, no. 39, pages 23634 - 23637, XP002124368 [X] 26 * abstract * * page 23635, column R, paragraph L - page 23636, column L, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.39.23634
 [X]  - LENA CLAESSON-WELSH, "Signal transduction by the PDGF receptors", PROGRESS IN GROWTH FACTOR RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 37 - 54, XP000856759 [X] 26,28,29 * abstract * * page 39, paragraph L - page 40, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0955-2235(94)90016-7
 [A]  - NORIHIKO NAKAMURA ET AL., "An epidermal growth factor receptor/Jak2 Tyrosine kinase domain chimera induces tyrosine phosphorylation of Stat5 and transduces a growth signal in hematopoietic cells", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, MD US, (19960809), vol. 271, no. 32, pages 19483 - 19488, XP002054015 [A] 26-66 * abstract * * page 19484, column R, paragraph 5 - page 19485, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 19485, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 19487, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 19488, column L, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.26.15336
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.