EP1075756 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATED FACSIMILE MESSAGE CONFIRMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phone.Com Inc. 1400 Seaport Boulevard Office W4152 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Phone.Com Inc. 1400 Seaport Boulevard Office #W4152 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | ||
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states Phone.Com Inc. 800 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOKSI, Himanshu 45055 Pawnee Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Siva, V. 114 Danburg Lane Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99914022.1 | 19.03.1999 | [2001/07] | WO1999US06173 | Priority number, date | US19980069675 | 29.04.1998 Original published format: US 69675 | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9956459 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1075756 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
H04N1/00212 (EP,US);
H04N1/00 (KR);
H04N1/00209 (EP,US);
H04N1/32112 (EP,US);
H04N1/32122 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0017 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0018 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0093 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3208 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3209 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN BESTÄTIGUNG VON FAKSIMILE-NACHRICHTEN | [2001/07] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATED FACSIMILE MESSAGE CONFIRMATION | [2001/07] | French: | TECHNIQUE ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT PERMETTANT UNE CONFIRMATION AUTOMATIQUE DE MESSAGE PAR TELECOPIE | [2001/07] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 07.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5459584 (GORDON RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,13-15,18-20,25,29-32,34,36,41,43,57,58,60,61,63,68,70-72 * column 10, line 10 - line 64 * * column 7, line 2 - line 10 * * column 8, line 35 - line 59 * [Y] 33,35,44,49-51,59,64,65,73,83; | [XY]EP0812100 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,13,81,82 * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 4; figures 3,12; claim 13 * [Y] 4,7,14-17,21,26,27,33,56,83; | [Y]EP0798899 (NEDERLAND PTT [NL]) [Y] 4,7,26,33,35,52,53,64,65 * column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 12 *; | [XAY]EP0835011 (MATSUSHITA GRAPHIC COMMUNIC [JP]) [X] 29,30,36,46-48,54,55 * column 11, line 1 - line 46; figures 16-18; claims 9-13,28 * [A] 9,10,22-24,38,39,54,55,66,67,74 [Y] 14-17,21,27,44,49-53,56,59,73,77; | [A]FR2748178 (GIROD RAOUL [FR]) [A] 12,22,37 * abstract *; | [XAY]US5675507 (BOBO II CHARLES R [US]) [X] 76 * column 8, line 41 - column 9, line 10; figures 5,8,9; claim 1 * * column 13, line 24 - line 33 * [A] 40,75 [Y] 77 |