EP1076892 - CUMULATIVE TWO PHASE DRIVE SCHEME FOR BISTABLE CHOLESTERIC REFLECTIVE DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENT STATE UNIVERSITY East Main & Lincoln Streets P.O. Box 5190 Research and Graduate Studies Kent, OH 44242-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states KENT STATE UNIVERSITY East Main & Lincoln Streets, P.O. Box 5190, Research and Graduate Studies Kent, OH 44242-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Deng-Ke 6122 Independence Drive Hudson, OH 44236 / US | 02 /
ZHU, Yang-Ming 1246 K Allerton Street Kent, OH 44240 / US | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Spall, Christopher John, et al BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99914070.0 | 23.03.1999 | [2001/08] | WO1999US06337 | Priority number, date | US19980076564 | 12.05.1998 Original published format: US 76564 | [2001/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9959128 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076892 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2001/08] | CPC: |
G09G3/3629 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0486 (EP,US);
G09G2310/06 (EP,US);
G09G2310/065 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0247 (EP,US);
G09G3/2007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/08] | Title | German: | KUMULATIVES ZWEI-PHASEN-ANSTEUERSCHEMA FÜR BISTABILE CHOLESTERISCH REFLEKTIERENDE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNGEN | [2001/08] | English: | CUMULATIVE TWO PHASE DRIVE SCHEME FOR BISTABLE CHOLESTERIC REFLECTIVE DISPLAYS | [2001/08] | French: | SYSTEME D'EXCITATION BIPHASEE CUMULATIVE D'AFFICHEURS REFLECTIFS CHOLESTERIQUES BISTABLES | [2001/08] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 19.04.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0523558 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 8 - column 8, line 20 * [A] 9; | [Y]EP0337780 (EMI PLC THORN [GB]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 18 - line 56; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US5748277 (HUANG XIAO-YANG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 7, line 50 - column 9, line 39 * * column 12, line 17 - line 45 * * column 13, line 5 - line 15 * * figures 3,5 *; | [PA]WO9855987 (KENT DISPLAYS INC [US]) [PA] 1,9 * page 19, line 1 - page 23, line 14; figures 4,5 * |