EP1079908 - IMPROVED DEFOAMER AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BetzDearborn Inc P O Box 3002 Trevose, PA 19053-6783 / US | [2001/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROMUALDO, Raimundo Franklin de Magalh es Street, 409 CEP-04374-000 S o Paulo, SP / BR | 02 /
LUIZ, Claudio, Candido Bahia Street, 303 CEP-06700-000 Cotia, SP / BR | 03 /
FERNANDES, Luiz Antonio Piassanguaba Avenue 2629, Planalto Paulista CEP-04060-003 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99914214.4 | 29.03.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999US06730 | Priority number, date | US19980066639 | 24.04.1998 Original published format: US 66639 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9955439 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1079908 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.11.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01D19/04, C09K3/00 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
B01D19/0404 (EP,US);
Y10S435/812 (EP,US);
Y10S516/904 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B01D19/0404, B01D19/0409 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER ENTSCHÄUMER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG | [2001/10] | English: | IMPROVED DEFOAMER AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2001/10] | French: | AGENT ANTIMOUSSE AMELIORE ET SES PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 17.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/26] | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2003 | 31.03.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2004 | 31.03.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.05.2005 | 31.03.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2007 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2508471 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 6, line 34 - line 35 * * page 6, line 9 - line 11 * * page 6, line 18 - line 26 * * page 6, line 36 - page 7, line 2 ** page 8, line 13 - line 14 *; | [X]US4405490 (MAAS JOACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 11-17 * column 2, line 34; claim 5 * * column 2, line 41 - line 64 * * column 5, line 61 * * column 2, line 9 - line 11 * * column 2, line 28 * * column 3, line 53 - line 63 * * column 1, line 65 - line 66 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 14 *; | [X]US5271868 (AZECHI SYUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 11-17 * column 5, line 19 - line 22 * * column 6, line 4 - line 10 * * column 6, line 39 * * column 6, line 48 * | International search | [A]US3784479 (KEIL J); | [A]US3984347 (KEIL JOSEPH W); | [Y]US4274977 (KOERNER GOETZ, et al); | [A]US4395352 (KULKARNI RAVINDRA D, et al); | [A]US5283004 (MIURA TAKAHIRO [JP]); | [A]US5431853 (TSUDA YASUTAKA [JP], et al); | [YP]US5843734 (SHONAKA MASAFUMI [JP], et al) |