EP1078012 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYTHIOETHERS HAVING PENDENT METHYL CHAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRC-DESOTO INTERNATIONAL, INC. 5430 San Fernando Road Glendale, CA 91209 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states PRC-DeSoto International, Inc. 5430 San Fernando Road Glendale, CA 91209 / US | ||
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states PRC-Desoto International, Inc. 5430 San Fernando Road Glendale, CA 91209 / US | ||
For all designated states De Moos, Suzanna 17420 Vanowen Street No. 5 Van Nuys, CA 91406 / US | |||
For all designated states Zook, Jonathan 20303 High Point Place Santa Clarita, CA 91351 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE MOSS, Suzanna 17420 Vanowen Street 5 Van Nuys, CA 91406 / US | 02 /
ZOOK, Jonathan 20303 High Point Place Santa Clarita, CA 91351 / US | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 99914284.7 | 29.03.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US06936 | Priority number, date | US19980052781 | 31.03.1998 Original published format: US 52781 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9950337 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078012 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1078012 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/00, C08G75/04, C08K5/49 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
C08G75/045 (EP,US);
C08G75/00 (KR);
C08G75/12 (US);
H05K3/285 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/09] | C08G75/00, C08K5/49 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYTHIOÄTHERN MIT METHYLGRUPPEN-ENTHALTENDEN SEITENKETTEN | [2001/09] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYTHIOETHERS HAVING PENDENT METHYL CHAINS | [2001/09] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE POLYTHIOETHERS A CHAINES METHYLE PENDANTES | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 24.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3859360 (OSWALD ALEXIS A, et al); | [A]US4609307 (GUY ARTHUR L [US], et al); | [A]US5225472 (CAMERON RANDY [US], et al) |