EP1062455 - METHOD FOR LAYING PIPES FOR FLUID UNDER HIGH PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rädlinger Maschinen- und Anlagenbau GmbH Kammerdorfer Strasse 16 93413 Cham / DE | For all designated states VNG- Verbundnetz Gas Aktiengesellschaft Braunstrasse 7 04347 Leipzig / DE | [2000/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÄDLINGER, Josef, jun Reichsburgstrasse 7 D-93413 Cham / DE | 02 /
WEISS, Walter Bahnhofstrasse 20 D-93483 Pösing / DE | 03 /
KÖPPING, Frank-Michael Strasse des 18.Oktober 3 D-04103 Leibzig / DE | 04 /
HEINZE, Frank Krimnickallee 5 15711 Königs-Wusterhausen / DE | [2001/38] |
Former [2000/52] | 01 /
RÄDLINGER, Josef, jun Reichsburgstrasse 7 D-93413 Cham / DE | ||
02 /
WEISS, Walter Bahnhofstrasse 20 D-93483 Pösing / DE | |||
03 /
KÖPPING, Frank-Michael Strasse des 18.Oktober 3 D-04103 Leibzig / DE | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2000/52] | Winter, Brandl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 99914499.1 | 09.03.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999EP01526 | Priority number, date | DE19981010373 | 10.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19810373 | [2000/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9946533 | Date: | 16.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062455 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062455 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/165 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
F16L55/1656 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [2000/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERLEGEN VON HOCHDRUCKFLUIDLEITUNGEN | [2000/52] | English: | METHOD FOR LAYING PIPES FOR FLUID UNDER HIGH PRESSURE | [2000/52] | French: | PROCEDE POUR POSER DES CONDUITES POUR FLUIDES SOUS HAUTE PRESSION | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0370108 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6* page 1, line 13 - line 20; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0676579 (CANT RICHARD SAMUEL [AU]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 21 - line 28 * * column 3, line 30 - line 33 * | by applicant | US5205886 | DE4403370 |