EP1084157 - METHOD FOR HYDROGENATING AROMATIC POLYMERS IN THE PRESENCE OF BRANCHED HYDROCARBONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEGE, Volker Bismarckplatz 45 D-47799 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
RECHNER, Johann Friedrich-Kramer-Strasse 2 D-47906 Kempen / DE | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Klimiuk, Meike Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Klimiuk-Japadita, Meike Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99914556.8 | 29.03.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999EP02138 | Priority number, date | DE1998115737 | 08.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19815737 | [2001/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9952953 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1084157 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/04, C08G85/00 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
C08F8/04 (EP,KR);
C08F210/02 (KR);
C08F210/06 (KR);
C08F212/12 (KR);
C08F216/06 (KR);
C08F218/04 (KR);
C08F220/14 (KR);
C08F220/18 (KR);
C08F220/44 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/04, C08F12/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HYDRIERUNG AROMATISCHER POLYMERE IN GEGENWART VERZWEIGTER KOHLENWASSERSTOFFE | [2001/12] | English: | METHOD FOR HYDROGENATING AROMATIC POLYMERS IN THE PRESENCE OF BRANCHED HYDROCARBONS | [2001/12] | French: | PROCEDE D'HYDROGENATION DE POLYMERES AROMATIQUES EN PRESENCE D'HYDROCARBURES RAMIFIES | [2001/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 23.08.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS6462307 ; | [Y]US3023201 (MOBERLY CHARLES W, et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 21; claims 1-11 *; | [X]GB1020720 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [X] 1-16 * page 3, line 64 - line 79; claims 1-15 *; | [A]US3433845 (KOVACH STEPHEN M, et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 38 - line 49; claims 1-8 *; | [Y]EP0601953 (REPSOL QUIMICA SA [ES]) [Y] 1-16 * claims 1-14 *; | [DA]US5654253 (HUCUL DENNIS A [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column 4, line 24 - line 33 * * column 2, line 17 - line 61; claims 1-5 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 16, Database accession no. 89-117705, XP002108928 & JPS6462307 A 19890308 (NEW JAPAN CHEM. CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * |