21.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
27.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
29.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |
22.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
05.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] |
24.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] |
27.08.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] |
20.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
25.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] |
11.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
07.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] |
23.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
05.09.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] |
15.08.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.08.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.02.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.04.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.04.2002 |
First examination report |
|
15.12.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] |
15.12.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] |
10.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|