Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002511445 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | KR9900178 | 14.04.1999 | KR19980013172 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013173 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013174 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3345599 | Global Dossier | 01.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | KR9900178 | 14.04.1999 | KR19980013172 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013173 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013174 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1071654 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2003 | B1 | EP1071654 | 31.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR9900178 | 14.04.1999 | KR19980013172 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013173 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013174 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE252543T | 15.11.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | KR9900178 | 14.04.1999 | KR19980013172 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013173 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013174 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2328124 | 21.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR9900178 | 14.04.1999 | KR19980013172 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013173 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013174 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69912264T | 22.07.2004 | T2 | DE69912264D1 | 27.11.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR9900178 | 14.04.1999 | KR19980013172 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013173 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013174 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100469946B | 17.05.2005 | B1 | KR19990080146 | 05.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980013173 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100469947B | 08.04.2005 | B1 | KR19990080147 | 05.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980013174 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100489649B | 02.09.2005 | B1 | KR19990080145 | 05.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980013172 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6417403 | 09.07.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR9900178 | 14.04.1999 | KR19980013172 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013173 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013174 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9952855 | Global Dossier | 21.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR19980013172 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013173 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013174 | 14.04.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1301248 | 27.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | KR19980013172 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013173 | 14.04.1998 | KR19980013174 | 14.04.1998 |