EP1070328 - RARE EARTH METAL SWITCHED MAGNETIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08 Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARRIGUS, Darryl, F. 24306 S.E. 42nd Place Issaquah, WA 98209 / US | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2001/04] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99914981.8 | 25.03.1999 | [2001/04] | WO1999US06282 | Priority number, date | US19980080966P | 07.04.1998 Original published format: US 80966 P | US19980123936 | 27.07.1998 Original published format: US 123936 | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9952117 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1070328 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070328 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/03 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
H01F1/0306 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5377 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/04] | Title | German: | DURCH SELTENERD-METALL GESCHALTETE MAGNETISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2003/34] | English: | RARE EARTH METAL SWITCHED MAGNETIC DEVICES | [2001/04] | French: | DISPOSITIFS MAGNETIQUES COMMUTES A ELEMENT A BASE DE METAL DES TERRES RARES | [2001/04] |
Former [2001/04] | DURCH SELENERD-METALL GESCHALTETE MAGNETISCHE ANORDNUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 14.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.2004
11.09.2006
WITHDRAWN Airbus SAS 1 Rond-Point Maurice Bellonte 31700 Blagnac / FR Opponent's representative Quantin, Bruno Marie Henri Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.2004
11.09.2006
WITHDRAWN Airbus SAS 1 Rond-Point Maurice Bellonte 31700 Blagnac / FR Opponent's representative Quantin, Bruno Marie Henri Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.2004
Airbus SAS 1 Rond-Point Maurice Bellonte 31700 Blagnac / FR Opponent's representative Quantin, Bruno Marie Henri Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | 21.01.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.10.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.09.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.01.2007 | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 12.10.2006 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2007/18] | 30.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.12.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   03.01.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS583944 ; | [A]US3126492 (T.SWOBODA) [A] 1,7,22 * figure 8; example 8; claims 1-3,6 *; | [X]US3963829 (JOHNSON VANCLIFF) [X] 1-6,9,22-26 * column 1, line 47 - line 56; example 3; claim 1 *; | [A] - L.D.KIROL ET AL, "numerical analysis of thermomagnetic generators", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS., NEW YORK US, (19840801), vol. 56, no. 3, pages 824 - 828, XP002108300 [A] 1-5 * page 824; figure 1 * * page 826, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, line 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.334015 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 07, Database accession no. 83-16439K, XP002108301 & JPS583944 A 19830110 (SHINETSU CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |