EP1066575 - INTERACTIVE SEARCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DRAGON SYSTEMS INC. 320 Nevada Street Newton, MA 02160 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states DRAGON SYSTEMS INC. 320 Nevada Street Newton, MA 01260 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRUE, Sean, D. 4 Retrop Road Natick, MA 01760 / US | 02 /
YOUNG, Jonathan, H. 47 Churchill Street Newtonville, MA 02160 / US | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Howe, Steven, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 99915142.6 | 31.03.1999 | [2001/02] | WO1999US06989 | Priority number, date | US19980052900 | 31.03.1998 Original published format: US 52900 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9950764 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066575 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
G06F16/40 (EP,US);
G06F16/43 (US);
Y10S707/99933 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/02] | Title | German: | INTERAKTIVES SUCHEN | [2001/02] | English: | INTERACTIVE SEARCHING | [2001/02] | French: | RECHERCHE INTERACTIVE | [2001/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/36] | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2001 | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 31.03.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0507743 (STENOGRAPH CORP [US]) [A] 1,16,17,32 * abstract ** page 2, line 21 - page 2, line 50 *; | [A]EP0649144 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]US5649060 (ELLOZY HAMED A [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * abstract * * column 2, line 2 - column 3, line 9 * * claim - *; | [X] - HEARST M A, "TILEBARS: VISUALIZATION OF TERM DISTRIBUTION INFORMATION IN FULL TEXT INFORMATION ACCESS", HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, CHI '95 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. DENVER, MAY 7 - 11, 1995, KATZ I R ET AL (ED ), (19950507), ISBN 0-201-84705-1, pages 59 - 66, XP000538437 [X] 1,4,6,17,20,22 * page 61, column 2, line 15 - page 64, column 2, line 2 * |