EP1067945 - METHODS FOR REDUCING CHOLESTEROL USING BACILLUS COAGULANS SPORES, SYSTEMS AND COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ganeden Biotech, Inc. Suite 209, 5940 Pacific Mesa Court San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2006/01] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Ganeden Biotech, Inc. Suite 209, 5940 Pacific Mesa Court San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARMER, Sean 8738-6 Villa La Jolla Drive La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
LEFKOWITZ, Andrew, R. Unit C, 8625 Via Mallorca La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2001/03] | MacLean, Martin Robert, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99915251.5 | 01.04.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999US07360 | Priority number, date | US19980080378P | 01.04.1998 Original published format: US 80378 P | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9949877 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1067945 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067945 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61P3/06 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
A61K35/747 (EP);
A61K31/366 (EP);
A61K31/787 (EP);
A61K35/742 (EP);
A61K35/745 (EP);
A61K36/28 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/366, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/787, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K35/742, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K35/745, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2001/03] | A61K35/74, // (A61K35/74, 38:04, 31:70),(A61K35/74, 35:78, 31:70) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] | Title | German: | ERFAHREN ZÜR VERRINGERUNG VON CHOLESTERIN MIT BACILLUS COAGULANS SPOREN, SYSTEME UN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2001/03] | English: | METHODS FOR REDUCING CHOLESTEROL USING BACILLUS COAGULANS SPORES, SYSTEMS AND COMPOSITIONS | [2001/03] | French: | METHODES DE REDUCTION DU CHOLESTEROL PAR DES SPORES DE BACILLUS COAGULANS, SYSTEMES ET COMPOSITIONS ASSOCIES | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Request for further processing for: | 08.09.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.01.2006 | FI | 04.01.2006 | IT | 04.01.2006 | NL | 04.01.2006 | DK | 04.04.2006 | SE | 04.04.2006 | GR | 05.04.2006 | PT | 05.06.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/21] | FI | 04.01.2006 | |
IT | 04.01.2006 | ||
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
DK | 04.04.2006 | ||
SE | 04.04.2006 | ||
GR | 05.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/17] | FI | 04.01.2006 | |
IT | 04.01.2006 | ||
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
DK | 04.04.2006 | ||
SE | 04.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | FI | 04.01.2006 | |
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
DK | 04.04.2006 | ||
SE | 04.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | FI | 04.01.2006 | |
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
SE | 04.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 04.01.2006 | |
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
SE | 04.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 04.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6261572 ; | [A]EP0307158 (JAPAN MAIZE PROD [JP]) [A] 1-76 * page 5, line 36 - line 42 *; | [A]EP0457539 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-76 * page 2, line 28 - line 31 * * page 4, line 39 - line 48 * * page 5, line 9 - line 18; examples 4,5,9; claim - *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870821), vol. 011, no. 259, Database accession no. (C - 441), & JP62061572 A 19870318 (NIPPON OIL & FATS CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-76 * abstract * | [A] - G. MOLIN ET AL., "EFFECT OF FERMENTED OATMEAL SOUP ON THE CHOLESTEROL LEVEL AND THE LACTOBACILLUS COLONIZATION OF RAT INTESTINAL MUCOSA", ANTONIE VAN LEEUWENHOEK, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1992), vol. 61, no. 3, pages 167 - 173, XP002119334 [A] 1-76 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00584223 | [DA] - J.C. MOHAN ET AL., "PRELIMINARY OBSERVATIONS ON EFFECT OF LACTOBACILLUS SPOROGENES ON SERUM LIPID LEVELS IN HYPERCHOLESTEROLEMIC PATIENTS.", THE INDIAN JOURNAL OF MEDICAL RESEARCH, NEW DELHI, (1990), vol. 92, pages 431 - 432, XP002119335 [DA] 1-76 * the whole document * | [PX] - G. SCHAAFSMA ET AL., "EFFECTS OF A MILK PRODUCT, FERMENTED BY LACTOBACILLUS ACIDOPHILUS AND WITH FRUCTO-OLIGOSACCHARIDES ADDED, ON BLOOD LIPIDS IN MALE VOLUNTEERS.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, LONDON, GB, (199806), vol. 52, no. 6, pages 436 - 440, XP002119336 [PX] 1-18,29-42,53-65,76 * page 439, column R, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.ejcn.1600583 |