Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1084346
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
21.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
07.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
06.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] |
13.09.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] |
21.09.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.11.2001 [2001/45] |
18.07.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
04.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.04.2001 |
First examination report |
|
06.04.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
02.02.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
02.02.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
23.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|