Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3535460B | Global Dossier | 07.06.2004 | B2 | JP2002516957 | 11.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9907464 | 05.04.1999 | US8608598 | 28.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1084346 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2001 | B1 | EP1084346 | 21.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9907464 | 05.04.1999 | US8608598 | 28.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9910757 | 13.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9907464 | 05.04.1999 | US8608598 | 28.05.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69900438D1 | 13.12.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9907464 | 05.04.1999 | US8608598 | 28.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9961788 | Global Dossier | 02.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8608598 | 28.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100427422B | Global Dossier | 13.04.2004 | B1 | KR20010043871 | 25.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US8608598 | 28.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6053149 | 25.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US8608598 | 28.05.1998 |