EP1064084 - APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR THE CONTINUOUS PREPARATION OF A FLUID WITH AUTOMATIC ADJUSTMENT OF THE PROPERTIES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renner Herrmann S.A. Avenida Assis Brasil, 3966 91010-003 Porto Alegre, RS / BR | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATISTA AUAD, Rogerio Rua Açores 328, Apartamento 307 Passo D'Areia, CEP-Porto Alegre, RS / BR | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Nettleton, John Victor Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Nettleton, John Victor Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99915387.7 | 26.03.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999BR00021 | Priority number, date | BR19989801134 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: BR 9801134 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9948602 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064084 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064084 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01F15/04, G05D11/13, B44D3/00, G01J3/46 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
G01J3/46 (EP,US);
B01F35/2136 (EP,US);
B01F23/49 (EP,US);
B01F35/2131 (EP,US);
B01F35/2134 (EP,US);
B01F35/82 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Extension states | AL | 16.10.2000 | LT | 16.10.2000 | LV | 16.10.2000 | MK | 16.10.2000 | RO | 16.10.2000 | SI | 16.10.2000 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG EINES FLUIDS MIT AUTOMATISCHER EINSTELLUNG DEREN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2001/01] | English: | APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR THE CONTINUOUS PREPARATION OF A FLUID WITH AUTOMATIC ADJUSTMENT OF THE PROPERTIES THEREOF | [2001/01] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION CONTINUE D'UN FLUIDE AVEC AJUSTEMENT AUTOMATIQUE DES PROPRIETES DUDIT FLUIDE | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 25.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.09.2003 | BE | 03.09.2003 | CH | 03.09.2003 | CY | 03.09.2003 | FI | 03.09.2003 | FR | 03.09.2003 | LI | 03.09.2003 | DK | 03.12.2003 | GR | 03.12.2003 | SE | 03.12.2003 | ES | 14.12.2003 | PT | 03.02.2004 | IE | 26.03.2004 | LU | 26.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | [2013/51] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
BE | 03.09.2003 | ||
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
CY | 03.09.2003 | ||
FI | 03.09.2003 | ||
FR | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
IE | 26.03.2004 | ||
LU | 26.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
BE | 03.09.2003 | ||
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
FI | 03.09.2003 | ||
FR | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
IE | 26.03.2004 | ||
LU | 26.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
BE | 03.09.2003 | ||
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
FI | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
IE | 26.03.2004 | ||
LU | 26.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
BE | 03.09.2003 | ||
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
FI | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
LU | 26.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
BE | 03.09.2003 | ||
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
FI | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
BE | 03.09.2003 | ||
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
FI | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
ES | 14.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
BE | 03.09.2003 | ||
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
FI | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
DK | 03.12.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
BE | 03.09.2003 | ||
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
FI | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
PT | 03.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
BE | 03.09.2003 | ||
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
FI | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
CH | 03.09.2003 | ||
FI | 03.09.2003 | ||
LI | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
FI | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 03.09.2003 | |
FI | 03.09.2003 | ||
GR | 03.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 03.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2376198 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,6* claim - *; | [XY]US4403866 (FALCOFF ALLAN F [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * figure 1; claim - * [Y] 5,9; | [Y]EP0308027 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [Y] 5,9 * claims 1,7 *; | [Y]US4974964 (YOSHIHARA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 5,9 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0407927 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * claim - *; | [A]EP0646409 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,6 * figure 1; claims 1,16 * |