EP1173097 - ULTRASONIC SCANNING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texon Technologies Ltd. 520-789 West Pender Street Vancouver British Columbia V6C 1H2 / CA | [2008/30] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Texon Technologies Ltd. 520-789 West Pender Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6C 1H2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBLANSKI, John 205 - 4160 Sardis Street Burnaby, British Columbia V5H 1K2 / CA | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/04] | Gritschneder, Martin, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99915423.0 | 16.04.1999 | [2002/04] | WO1999CA00350 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0062676 | Date: | 26.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1173097 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1173097 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
A61B8/0875 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/04] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALL-ABTASTEINRICHTUNG | [2002/04] | English: | ULTRASONIC SCANNING APPARATUS | [2002/04] | French: | APPAREIL D'EXPLORATION A ULTRASON | [2002/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   20.05.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2008 | BE | 23.07.2008 | CY | 23.07.2008 | DK | 23.07.2008 | FI | 23.07.2008 | IT | 23.07.2008 | NL | 23.07.2008 | SE | 23.10.2008 | GR | 24.10.2008 | ES | 03.11.2008 | PT | 23.12.2008 | GB | 16.04.2009 | IE | 16.04.2009 | LU | 16.04.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
GR | 24.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
GB | 16.04.2009 | ||
IE | 16.04.2009 | ||
LU | 16.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
GB | 16.04.2009 | ||
IE | 16.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 23.07.2008 | |
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 23.07.2008 | |
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4276491 (DANIEL KEITH P) [A] 1,8,15,18,21 * column 6, line 21 - line 50 ** column 7, line 7 - column 8, line 13 *; | [YA]US5003965 (TALISH ROGER J [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,8,15 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 68 * * column 4, line 41 - line 47 * [A] 16,17,21,29,9,10,14; | [DA]US5335661 (KOBLANSKI JOHN N [CA]) [DA] 1,2,8,10,15-18 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 8 * [A] 22; | [A]EP0761169 (LILLY INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3,5,15-17,25 * column 2, line 7 - line 40 * * column 3, line 34 - line 39 *; | [YA]EP0786232 (ALOKA CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,8,15 * column 8, line 46 - column 10, line 31 * * column 20, line 7 - column 22, line 57 * [A] 5,16-18 |