blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979393

EP0979393 - Delivering a product with movable hoppers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/07]SUCROSE-N-ALKYL ASPARAGINATES, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF
[2000/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.11.2001 [2001/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MULTIPOND WÄGETECHNIK GMBH
Traunreuter Strasse 2
D-84470 Waldkraiburg / DE
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIDHUBER, Josef
Maximilianstrasse 25a
D-84559 Kraiburg / DE
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Prüfer, Lutz H., et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte
Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date99915536.925.02.1999
[2000/07]
WO1999EP01219
Priority number, dateDE199810847402.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19808474
[2000/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9945347
Date:10.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979393
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979393
Date:15.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.09.1999
ClassificationIPC:G01G13/16, G01G19/393
[2000/07]
CPC:
G01G13/16 (EP,US); G01G19/393 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   NL [2000/07]
TitleGerman:Produktausgabevorrichtung mit bewegbaren Auffangbehältern[2000/15]
English:Delivering a product with movable hoppers[2000/15]
French:Dépense d'un produit avec des récipients mouvants[2000/15]
Former [2000/07]PRODUKTAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN PRODUKTBEREITSTELLUNGSSYSTEM
Former [2000/07]SUCROSE-N-ALKYL ASPARAGINATES, PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF
Former [2000/07]N-ALKYLASPARAGINATES DE SACCHAROSE, LEUR PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase22.10.1999National basic fee paid 
22.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
22.10.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
15.03.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.03.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
12.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2000Fee for grant paid
21.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/45]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP0113586  (ISHIDA SCALE MFG CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1 * column 8, line 27 - column 9, line 15; figure 3 *;
 [A]GB2131963  (STEEL HENRY JOHN) [A] 1 * page 2, line 113 - line 128; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4404897  (MULTIPOND WAEGETECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0725263  (ISHIDA SEISAKUSHO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 12, line 13 - line 24; figure 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.