EP0990102 - DEVICE FOR FIXING A TUBE ON A SUPPORT, IN PARTICULAR IN A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2, rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2 rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DROUET, Philippe 33, rue de la Vallée F-45200 Amilly / FR | 02 /
DOUEZ, Régis 4, allée du Petit Lancy F-45120 Chalette / FR | [2000/19] |
Former [2000/14] | 01 /
DROUET, Philippe 3, rue Pature aux Bornes F-45260 Chailly / FR | ||
02 /
DOUEZ, Régis 4, allée du Petit Lancy F-45120 Chalette / FR | Representative(s) | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc, et al CABINET ORES, 6, Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99915845.4 | 27.04.1999 | [2000/14] | WO1999FR00993 | Priority number, date | FR19980005325 | 28.04.1998 Original published format: FR 9805325 | [2000/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9956051 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0990102 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/033, F16L3/10 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
F16L55/035 (EP);
F16L3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [2000/14] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES ROHRES AN EINEM TRÄGER, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2000/14] | English: | DEVICE FOR FIXING A TUBE ON A SUPPORT, IN PARTICULAR IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2000/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN TUBE SUR UN SUPPORT, EN PARTICULIER DANS UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2000/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 24.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/16] | 18.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE7429114U (WISAN IMPORT A.G.) [A] 1 * page 7, line 8 - line 11 * * page 7, line 24 - line 27 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0638756 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4406574 (RASMUSSEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2765943 |