EP0988468 - ELECTRICALLY ACTUATED BRAKE WITH AUTOMATIC PLAY ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Automotive Products Italia (SV) S.p.A. Corso Marconi 160 Cairo Montenotte, Savona / IT | For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS plc Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Automotive Products Italia (SV) S.p.A. Corso Marconi 160 Cairo Montenotte, Savona / IT | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | |||
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Automotive Products (Italia) S.p.A. Via Montecarrottese, 2 60030 Moie Di Maiolati, Spontini, Ancona / IT | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV31 3ER / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUCINOTTA, Luigi Via Leopardi, 11/2 I-20020 Arese / IT | 02 /
PEASLEY, David 110 Needlers End Lane, Balsall Common Coventry CV7 7AB / GB | 03 /
YOUNG, Alastair, John 39 Roundshill Kenilworth, Warwickshire CV8 1DW / GB | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Roger, et al Automotive Products Group Ltd. Patent Department P.O. Box 2085 Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire, CV31 3ZL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | Morrall, Roger, et al Automotive Products Group Ltd. Patent Department P.O. Box 2085, Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire, CV31 3ZL / GB | ||
Former [2000/13] | Morrall, Roger Automotive Products UK Ltd, P.O. Box 1762, Tachbrook Road Leamington Spa, Warwickshire, CV31 3ZT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99915929.6 | 13.04.1999 | [2000/13] | WO1999GB01127 | Priority number, date | GB19980007726 | 14.04.1998 Original published format: GB 9807726 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9953214 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0988468 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0988468 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/66, F16D51/20 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
F16D65/62 (EP);
B60T13/741 (EP);
F16D51/18 (EP);
F16D2065/386 (EP);
F16D2066/005 (EP);
F16D2121/24 (EP);
F16D2125/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/13] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH BETÄTIGTE BREMSE MIT AUTOMATISCHER SPIELEINSTELLUNG | [2000/13] | English: | ELECTRICALLY ACTUATED BRAKE WITH AUTOMATIC PLAY ADJUSTMENT | [2000/13] | French: | FREIN A COMMANDE ELECTRIQUE A AJUSTEMENT DE JEU AUTOMATIQUE | [2000/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 24.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 02.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Request for further processing for: | 29.05.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.08.2004 | ES | 15.11.2004 | [2006/32] |
Former [2005/23] | ES | 15.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4928543 (JOHANNESEN DONALD D ET AL) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 20 - line 29; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO8910496 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC) [A] 1,2,4,6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0703133 (CONTINENTAL AG) [A] 1,5,6,8 * abstract *; | [A]DE19536694 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract * * column 3, line 7 - line 17 *; | [A]US5366280 (LITTLEJOHN DERON C) |