EP1000361 - VOLTAGE LEVEL INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN VELZEN, Jeroen Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
LIEDENBAUM, Coen, T., H., F. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Raap, Adriaan Yde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Raap, Adriaan Yde INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99915978.3 | 06.05.1999 | [2000/20] | WO1999IB00810 | Priority number, date | EP19980201608 | 18.05.1998 Original published format: EP 98201608 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9960414 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1000361 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/00 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
G01R13/406 (EP,KR,US);
G01R15/04 (KR);
G01R19/155 (KR);
Y10S362/80 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/20] | Title | German: | SPANNUNGSPEGELANZEIGE | [2000/20] | English: | VOLTAGE LEVEL INDICATOR | [2000/20] | French: | VOLTMETRE | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 18.02.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0734078 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]US5424560 (NORMAN MICHAEL P [US], et al); | [AP]US5866922 (HUANG RONG TING [US], et al); | [A]JPS61198690 ; | [A]JPH02120676 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870129), & JP61198690 A 00000000 (OSHINO DENKI SEISAKUSHO:KK) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP02120676 A 19900508 |