EP1012243 - MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY 3-6-A SPECIFIC TO SURFACE OF DENDRITIC CELLS AMONG THE PERIPHERAL BLOOD LEUKOCYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bae, Yong Soo 308-704, Expo Apartment, Jeonmin-dong, Yusong-gu Taejon 305-390 / KR | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAE, Yong, Soo 308-704, Expo Apartment, Jeonmin-dong Yusong-gu, Taejon 305-390 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Beom, Kyu 305, Kongwon Jootaek 242-7, Joongri-dong Taeduck-gu, Taejon 306-050 / KR | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99916067.4 | 29.04.1999 | [2000/26] | WO1999KR00212 | Priority number, date | KR19980024502 | 27.06.1998 Original published format: KR 9824502 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0000592 | Date: | 06.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012243 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 06.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/20, C12N15/12, C07K16/30, C12N15/70, C12N15/85 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,KR);
C07K14/70539 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | MONOKLONALER ANTIKÖRPER 3-6-A SPEZIFISCH FÜR OBERFLÄCHEN VON DENTRITISCHEN ZELLEN AUS EINER MENGE VON PERIPHERALEN BLUTLEUKOZYTEN | [2000/26] | English: | MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY 3-6-A SPECIFIC TO SURFACE OF DENDRITIC CELLS AMONG THE PERIPHERAL BLOOD LEUKOCYTES | [2000/26] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL 3-6-A SPECIFIQUE A LA SURFACE DES CELLULES DENDRITIQUES PARMI LES LEUCOCYTES DU SANG PERIPHERIQUE | [2000/26] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 01.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/20] | 06.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9304187 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB]); | [A]WO9512404 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al); | [A]WO9515340 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]); | [A]WO9748798 (GENETICS INST [US]) |