EP1073564 - OPEN ROOF CONSTRUCTION FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Opposition rejected | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inalfa Roof Systems Group B.V. Smakterweg 70 5804 AH Venray / NL | [2004/16] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states Inalfa Roof Systems Group B.V. Smakterweg 70 5804 AH Venray / NL | ||
For all designated states Hermsen, Erwin Jacobus Christian Leonardus Overloonseweg 91 5804 AT Venray / NL | |||
For all designated states Rooijakkers, Alphonsus Theodorus Bernardus Johannes Vijghstraat 44 6524 BV Nijmegen / NL | |||
For all designated states Manders, Peter Christiaan Leonardus Johannes Van Bronckhorststraat 70 5961 SM Horst / NL | |||
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states Inalfa Industries B.V. Maasheseweg 83 5804 AB Venray / NL | ||
For all designated states Hermsen, Erwin Jacobus Christian Leonardus Overloonseweg 91 5804 AT Venray / NL | |||
For all designated states Rooijakkers, Alphonsus Theodorus Bernardus Johannes Vijghstraat 44 6524 BV Nijmegen / NL | |||
For all designated states Manders, Peter Christiaan Leonardus Johannes Van Bronckhorststraat 70 5961 SM Horst / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERMSEN, Erwin, Jacobus, Christian, Leonardus Overloonseweg 91 NL-5804 AT Venray / NL | 02 /
ROOIJAKKERS, Alphonsus, Theodorus, Bernardus Johannes Vijghstraat 44 NL-6524 BV Nijmegen / NL | 03 /
MANDERS, Peter, Christiaan, Leonardus, Johannes Van Bronckhorststraat 70 NL-5961 SM Horst / NL | 04 /
NABUURS, Martinus, Wilhelmus, Maria Trantert 66 NL-5825 JT Overloon / NL | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Metman, Karel Johannes, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Metman, Karel Johannes, et al De Vries & Metman B.V., Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 99916081.5 | 22.04.1999 | [2001/06] | WO1999NL00233 | Priority number, date | NL19981009021 | 28.04.1998 Original published format: NL 1009021 | NL19981009857 | 13.08.1998 Original published format: NL 1009857 | [2001/06] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9955546 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1073564 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1073564 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/02 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
B60J7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/06] | Title | German: | KONSTRUKTION EINES ÖFFNUNGSFÄHIGEN FAHRZEUGSDACHES | [2001/06] | English: | OPEN ROOF CONSTRUCTION FOR A VEHICLE | [2001/06] | French: | STRUCTURE DE TOIT OUVRANT POUR VEHICULE | [2001/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1999 | Translation filed | 08.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 22.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.2004
21.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Webasto AG Kraillinger Str.5 82 131 Stockdorf / DE Opponent's representative Wiese, Gerhard Fischer & Konnerth Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Schertlinstrasse 18 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.2004
Webasto AG Kraillinger Str.5 82 131 Stockdorf / DE Opponent's representative Wiese, Gerhard Wiese & Konnerth Patentanwälte, Georgenstrasse 6 82152 Planegg / DE | 17.05.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.06.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.01.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.02.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.02.2005 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 12.01.2007 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/18] | Appeal following opposition | 14.04.2005 | Appeal received No. T0475/05 | 04.07.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.01.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 12.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.01.2007 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 07.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 07.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2234852 (AUDI AG) [A] 1 * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 5; figure . *; | [A]US3558183 (SIGMUND GERHARD) [A] 1 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 69; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0802077 (WEBASTO KAROSSERIESYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0338614 |