EP1093437 - INFLATION METHOD AND APPARATUS OF INFLATABLE OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Propulsion Company, Inc. 25401 North Central Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85027-7899 / US | [2004/23] |
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states Universal Propulsion Company, Inc. 25401 North Central Avenue Phoenix AZ 85027-7899 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIS, Donald, J. 11863 East Del Timbre Drive Scottsdale, AZ 85259 / US | 02 /
OLANDER, Donald, E. 210 E. Calle de Arcos Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | 03 /
MAGENOT, Michael, C. 14618 North 24th Place Phoenix, AZ 85032 / US | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 99916130.0 | 12.03.1999 | [2001/17] | WO1999US05509 | Priority number, date | US19980039261 | 16.03.1998 Original published format: US 39261 | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947452 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1093437 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1093437 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/00, B63C9/125, B63B35/58, B60R21/26 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
B63C9/18 (EP,US);
B67D99/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2001/17] | B67D5/00, B63C9/125, B63B35/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBLASEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2001/17] | English: | INFLATION METHOD AND APPARATUS OF INFLATABLE OBJECT | [2001/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE GONFLAGE ET APPAREIL DESTINE A UN OBJET GONFLABLE | [2001/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 19.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.2004 | BE | 02.06.2004 | CH | 02.06.2004 | FI | 02.06.2004 | IT | 02.06.2004 | LI | 02.06.2004 | NL | 02.06.2004 | DK | 02.09.2004 | GR | 02.09.2004 | SE | 02.09.2004 | ES | 13.09.2004 | PT | 02.11.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/13] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
BE | 02.06.2004 | ||
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 02.06.2004 | |
CH | 02.06.2004 | ||
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 02.06.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 02.06.2004 | |
FI | 02.06.2004 | ||
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
ES | 13.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 02.06.2004 | |
LI | 02.06.2004 | ||
SE | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 02.06.2004 | |
LI | 02.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3833029 (MUNN A); | [A]US4062288 (MILLRAY ROBERT); | [A]US4097241 (GARNER EUGENE F, et al); | [X]US5494312 (RINK KARL K [US]); | [X]US5601310 (DI GIACOMO MICHAEL [US], et al) | by applicant | US4355987 | US4368009 | US5586615 |