EP1068357 - THERAPEUTIC AND DIAGNOSTIC APPLICATIONS BASED ON THE ROLE OF THE CXCR-4 GENE IN TUMORIGENESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LU | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NorthWest Biotherapeutics, Inc. 4800 Montgomery Lane, Suite 800 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2011/36] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states NorthWest Biotherapeutics, Inc. Suite 236, 120 Northgate Plaza Seattle, WA 98125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURPHY, Gerald, P. 1134 23rd Avenue E Seattle, WA 98112 / US | 02 /
BOYNTON, Alton, L. 2420 274th Avenue N.E. Redmond, WA 98053 / US | 03 /
SEHGAL, Anil Apartment H106 2104 North 105th Street Seattle, WA 98133 / US | [2011/38] |
Former [2001/03] | 01 /
MURPHY, Gerald, P. 1134 23rd Avenue E Seattle, WA 98112 / US | ||
02 /
BOYNTON, Alton, L. 2420 274th Avenue N.E. Redmond, WA 98053 / US | |||
03 /
SEHGAL, Anil Apartment H106, 2104 North 105th Street Seattle, WA 98133 / US | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/03] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99916365.2 | 29.03.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999US07431 | Priority number, date | US19980079916P | 30.03.1998 Original published format: US 79916 P | US19980104656P | 16.10.1998 Original published format: US 104656 P | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9950461 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068357 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1068357 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1068357 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, C07K16/00, C12N15/11, C12N15/85, C07H21/04, A61K39/395, A61K48/00 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07K14/7158 (EP,US);
C07K16/24 (EP,US);
C07K16/2866 (EP,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/03] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE UND DIAGNOSTISCHE ANWENDUNGEN WELCHE AUF DER ROLLE VON CXCR-4 IN DER TUMORGENESE BASIEREN | [2001/03] | English: | THERAPEUTIC AND DIAGNOSTIC APPLICATIONS BASED ON THE ROLE OF THE CXCR-4 GENE IN TUMORIGENESIS | [2001/03] | French: | APPLICATIONS THERAPEUTIQUES ET DIAGNOSTIQUES BASEES SUR LE ROLE DU GENE CXCR-4 DANS L'ONCOGENESE | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 21.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2008 | Observations by third parties | 29.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.04.2010 | 16.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10184637.6 / EP2308996 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2012
28.06.2012
ADMISSIBLE PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT 45, Place Abel Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR Opponent's representative Regimbeau, et al, et al 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/51] |
Former [2012/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2012
28.06.2012
ADMISSIBLE PIERRE FABRE MEDICAMENT 45, Place Abel Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR Opponent's representative Faivre Petit, Frédérique, et al, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | 30.07.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.04.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.04.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.07.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.10.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 27.06.2014 | Appeal received No. T1429/14 | 24.07.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.2003 | 31.03.2007 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2007 | 31.03.2010 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   17.09.2010 | 31.03.2011 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 23.01.2012 | AT | 29.03.2012 | CY | 29.03.2012 | FI | 29.03.2012 | IE | 29.03.2012 | SE | 30.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | DK | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | NL | 01.10.2012 | [2016/47] |
Former [2015/26] | PT | 23.01.2012 | |
AT | 29.03.2012 | ||
CY | 29.03.2012 | ||
FI | 29.03.2012 | ||
IE | 29.03.2012 | ||
SE | 30.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
DK | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NL | 01.10.2012 | ||
LU | 29.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | PT | 23.01.2012 | |
AT | 29.03.2012 | ||
CY | 29.03.2012 | ||
FI | 29.03.2012 | ||
IE | 29.03.2012 | ||
SE | 30.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
DK | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NL | 01.10.2012 | ||
GR | 08.10.2012 | ||
LU | 29.03.2014 | ||
Former [2013/36] | PT | 23.01.2012 | |
AT | 29.03.2012 | ||
CY | 29.03.2012 | ||
FI | 29.03.2012 | ||
IE | 29.03.2012 | ||
SE | 30.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
DK | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NL | 01.10.2012 | ||
GR | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | PT | 23.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9947158 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA], et al) [E] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XP] - SEHGAL ANIL ET AL, "CXCR-4, a chemokine receptor, is overexpressed in and required for proliferation of glioblastoma tumor cells.", JOURNAL OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY, (199810), vol. 69, no. 2, ISSN 0022-4790, pages 99 - 104, XP009010567 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-9098(199810)69:2<99::AID-JSO10>3.0.CO;2-M | [XP] - SEHGAL ANIL ET AL, "Molecular characterization of CXCR-4: A potential brain tumor-associated gene.", JOURNAL OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY, (199812), vol. 69, no. 4, ISSN 0022-4790, pages 239 - 248, XP009010566 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-9098(199812)69:4<239::AID-JSO9>3.0.CO;2-U | International search | [X]US5563048 (HONJO TASUKU [JP], et al); | [X]WO9728258 (NAT INST HEALTH [US]); | [X]WO9749424 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]); | [XP]WO9817308 (IMMUSOL INC [US], et al); | [XP] - KUSUNOKI A., ET AL., "INHIBITION OF THE PRODUCTION OF HIV-1 SECOND RECEPTOR CXCR4 BY ANTISENSE TECHNOLOGY.", Nucleic Acids Symposium Series, Oxford University Press, GB, GB, (19980901), no. 39., ISSN 0261-3166, page 263/264., XP002921359 | [X] - MCKNIGHT A., ET AL., "INHIBITION OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS FUSION BY A MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY TO A CORECEPTOR (CXCR4) IS BOTH CELL TYPE AND VIRUS STRAIN DEPENDENT.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY., US, US, (19970201), vol. 71., no. 02., ISSN 0022-538X, pages 1692 - 1696., XP002921360 | by applicant | - PARKER ET AL., CA CANCER J. CLIN., (1996), vol. 46, pages 5 - 28 | - ENGELHARD ET AL., NEUROSURGERY, (1997), vol. 41, page 886 | - HARIHABU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, page 28726 | - NOMURA ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 5, page 1239 | - FEDERSPPIEL ET AL., GENOMICS, (1993), vol. 16, page 707 | - LOCTSCHER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, page 232 | - DORANZ ET AL., IMMUNOL. RESH., (1997), vol. 16, page 15 | - FENG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 272, page 872 | - DORANZ ET AL., IMMUNOL. RES., (1997), vol. 16, page 15 | - ANN. REV. NEUROSCI., vol. 4, pages 17 - 42 | Opposition | WO9948528 | - SEHGAL A. ET AL, PROC. AMER. ASSOC. CANCER RESEARCH /ABSTRACT #1556, (19980328), vol. 39, page 228 |