EP1071413 - TOPICAL FORMULATIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF NAIL FUNGAL DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Suite A, 320 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2001/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAUDHURI, Bhaskar 10281 Parlett Place Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
CHIM, Ming, Fai 2446 38th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | 03 /
BUCKS, Daniel 101 Lerida Avenue Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99916543.4 | 09.04.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999US07774 | Priority number, date | US19980082187P | 17.04.1998 Original published format: US 82187 P | [2001/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9953913 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1071413 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1071413 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, A61K9/00, A61K9/70 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K9/0012 (EP,US);
A61K9/7015 (EP,US);
A61P31/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/05] | Title | German: | TOPISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NAGEL PILZERKRANKUNGEN | [2001/05] | English: | TOPICAL FORMULATIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF NAIL FUNGAL DISEASES | [2001/05] | French: | FORMULATIONS TOPIQUES DESTINEES AU TRAITEMENT DES MYCOSES UNGUEALES | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 10.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.06.2004 | BE | 16.06.2004 | CH | 16.06.2004 | FI | 16.06.2004 | FR | 16.06.2004 | IT | 16.06.2004 | LI | 16.06.2004 | NL | 16.06.2004 | DK | 16.09.2004 | GR | 16.09.2004 | SE | 16.09.2004 | DE | 17.09.2004 | ES | 27.09.2004 | PT | 16.11.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/47] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
FR | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
NL | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
DE | 17.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
FR | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
DE | 17.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/30] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
DE | 17.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
LI | 16.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH07206711 ; | [X]JPH06211651 ; | [X]EP0440298 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) [X] 1-4,9-11,13-15 * claims 1,5,8,12 *; | WO9611710 [ ] (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [X]DE19604190 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * claims 1,6,7 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 095, no. 011, & JP07206711 A 19950808 (HISAMITSU) [X] 1-5,7,9,11-16 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941104), vol. 018, no. 575, Database accession no. (C - 1268), & JP06211651 A 00000000 (HISAMITSU) [X] 1-5,7,9,11-16 * abstract * | [X] - MIYATA, SATORU ET AL, "External preparation for nail ringworm", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19960805), vol. 125, no. 6, Database accession no. 67762, XP002106439 [X] 1-5,7,9,11-16 * abstract * | [PX] - TANWEER, A. SYED, "Management of Toenail Onychomycosis with 2 % Butenafine and 20 % Urea Cream: A Placebo-controlled, Double Blind Study", THE JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, (199810), vol. 25, no. 10, pages 648 - 652, XP002106438 [PX] 1-3,20-22 * the whole document * |